NY S07513 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.214
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding the Black Creek located in Genesee and Wyoming counties to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Relates to adding the Black Creek located in Genesee and Wyoming counties to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.214 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.196 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10104a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1650 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7513A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10104 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7513a