NY S07510 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the city of White Plains to impose an occupancy tax through December 31, 2015.
Title
Extends the authority of the city of White Plains to impose an occupancy tax through December 31, 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.355 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a10513 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1288 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10513 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7510