NY S07463 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the disposition of a future estate not subject to a condition precedent vests per stirpes.
Title
Provides that the disposition of a future estate not subject to a condition precedent vests per stirpes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1049 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7463A |
2012-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2012-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09478 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - RECOMMITTED TO JUDICIARY