NY S07462 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows retired employees of the New York state teachers' retirement system who return to active service and suspend their pension benefit to elect to combine their service credit earned prior to retirement with the service credit earned after their restoration to active service, provided they have earned at least two years of service credit since such restoration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows retired employees of the New York state teachers' retirement system who return to active service and suspend their pension benefit to elect to combine their service credit earned prior to retirement with the service credit earned after their restoration to active service, provided they have earned at least two years of service credit since such restoration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.519
2024-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a10529
2024-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-04SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1703
2024-06-04SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 7462B
2024-06-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-05-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-05-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 7462A
2024-05-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1553
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10529 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s7462b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07462&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07462
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07462&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07462A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07462&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07462B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7462#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07462&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback