NY S07404 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9511A
Status: Introduced on April 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9511A
Summary
Authorizes the Time Out Club Development Corporation to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Time Out Club Development Corporation to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED BY A9511A | |
2010-06-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-10 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-09 | 1ST REPORT CAL.916 | |
2010-04-07 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A9511-A (Same As) 2010-07-15 - signed chap.187
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07404&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |