NY S07349 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September eleventh of each year as a day of commemoration known as "Emergency Responders' Appreciation Day".
Title
Designates September eleventh of each year as a day of commemoration known as "Emergency Responders' Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1183 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10185 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - referred to governmental operations