NY S07344 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Develops a financial literacy education program for teenagers and young adult participants in the summer youth employment program.
Title
Develops a financial literacy education program for teenagers and young adult participants in the summer youth employment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.421 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9199f |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7344D |
2014-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7344C |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7344B |
2014-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED 7344A |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.912 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09199 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7344d