NY S07342 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2026 and before January 1, 2028.
Title
Provides for a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service after January 1, 2026 and before January 1, 2028.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | AMENDED 7342A |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.307 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A00639 (Same As) 2024-04-10 - print number 639a