NY S07331 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to clean air taxicabs; provides for the issuance of one thousand three hundred fifty clean air taxicab medallions; repeals certain provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to clean air taxicabs; provides for the issuance of one thousand three hundred fifty clean air taxicab medallions; repeals certain provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.339
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-25Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-04-25Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-25Assemblyordered to third reading cal.753
2018-04-25Assemblysubstituted for a8936
2018-02-28Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-02-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-02-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.59
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08936 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - substituted by s7331

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback