NY S07291 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.377
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the services provided for the care demonstration program established by the office for people with developmental disabilities, the monitoring of such program and the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the services provided for the care demonstration program established by the office for people with developmental disabilities, the monitoring of such program and the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.377 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.756 |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | substituted for a8990 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.19 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08990 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - substituted by s7291