NY S07289 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to paid leave for certain employees; amends a chapter of the laws of the laws of 2017, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to paid leave for certain employees; amends a chapter of the laws of the laws of 2017, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.16 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.653 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | substituted for a8941 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.17 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08941 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - substituted by s7289