NY S07274 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including docks as an approved storm-related repair for the Lake Ontario-St. Lawrence Seaway flood recovery for owners of primary and seasonal residences.
Title
Relates to including docks as an approved storm-related repair for the Lake Ontario-St. Lawrence Seaway flood recovery for owners of primary and seasonal residences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.568 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |