NY S07219 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Leeds Hose Company No. 1, Inc. from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Title
Exempts the Leeds Hose Company No. 1, Inc. from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.463 |
2023-09-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.827 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a6721 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1775 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06721 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7219