NY S07208 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that the council on human blood and transfusion services shall review all current medical research and guidance regarding the donation of blood by patients with a history of Lyme or tick-borne illnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that the council on human blood and transfusion services shall review all current medical research and guidance regarding the donation of blood by patients with a history of Lyme or tick-borne illnesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to health
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1153
2018-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A09830 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback