NY S07199 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes that a person is guilty of arson when he damages a building or motor vehicle by fire or explosion in the course of the commission or attempted commission of a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes that a person is guilty of arson when he damages a building or motor vehicle by fire or explosion in the course of the commission or attempted commission of a felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2107
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 7199A
2018-01-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A10540 (Same As) 2018-05-04 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback