NY S07188 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.144
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.144
Summary
Extends from June 30, 2010 until June 30, 2012 the provisions relating to the Oneida Indian Nation real property tax depository fund.
Title
Extends from June 30, 2010 until June 30, 2012 the provisions relating to the Oneida Indian Nation real property tax depository fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | SIGNED CHAP.144 | |
2010-06-25 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-01 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-01 | ordered to third reading cal.958 | |
2010-06-01 | substituted for a10297 | |
2010-05-12 | referred to ways and means | |
2010-05-12 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-12 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-04-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-04-21 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-20 | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 | |
2010-03-19 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10297 (Same As) 2010-06-01 - substituted by s7188
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07188&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |