NY S07187 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits special districts to adopt local laws providing for an exemption for improvements to residential real property for the purpose of facilitating accessibility of such property to a physically disabled owner.
Title
Permits special districts to adopt local laws providing for an exemption for improvements to residential real property for the purpose of facilitating accessibility of such property to a physically disabled owner.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.111 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08980 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means