NY S07169 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program for Lyme and tick-borne disease testing in children.
Title
Establishes a pilot program for Lyme and tick-borne disease testing in children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1152 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10186 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - referred to health