NY S07159 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage oysters.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage oysters.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.171 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.735 |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9451 |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.637 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7159A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09451 (Same As) 2014-06-02 - substituted by s7159a