NY S07159 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignates the Niagara Escarpment Wine Trail and the Niagara Wine Trail as the Niagara Wine Trail Ridge and the Niagara Wine Trail Lake and amends the boundaries of such trails.
Title
Redesignates the Niagara Escarpment Wine Trail and the Niagara Wine Trail as the Niagara Wine Trail Ridge and the Niagara Wine Trail Lake and amends the boundaries of such trails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1107 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10207 (Same As) 2012-05-11 - referred to transportation