NY S07150 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to redistricting of congressional, senate and assembly districts; amends provisions directing plans to be submitted by the independent redistricting commission.
Title
Relates to redistricting of congressional, senate and assembly districts; amends provisions directing plans to be submitted by the independent redistricting commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-24 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.46 |
2021-11-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.633 |
2021-11-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.640 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7948 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1678 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07948 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7150