NY S07150 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.
Title
Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.314 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.267 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7150 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | rules report cal.294 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-04-22 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10317 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.267 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10317 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - signed chap.314