NY S07144 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to renunciation of property interests.
Title
Relates to renunciation of property interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.315 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.633 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | substituted for a9355a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09355 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - substituted by s7144