NY S07135 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 7135A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 7135A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain members who re-enter public service; extends tier reinstatement provisions to a retiree of a public retirement system who was an active member of a public retirement system on or after January 1, 1989.
Title
Relates to certain members who re-enter public service; extends tier reinstatement provisions to a retiree of a public retirement system who was an active member of a public retirement system on or after January 1, 1989.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7135A |
2012-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2012-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07703 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - print number 7703a