NY S07110 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to lowering the minimum required course load and permitting application prior to matriculation for the recruitment incentive and retention program for members of the New York state organized militia.
Title
Relates to lowering the minimum required course load and permitting application prior to matriculation for the recruitment incentive and retention program for members of the New York state organized militia.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1852 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09023 (Same As) 2018-01-12 - referred to higher education