NY S07109 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9504
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the town of Henrietta, county of Monroe.
Title
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the town of Henrietta, county of Monroe.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9504 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1268 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09504 (Same As) 2014-08-26 - signed chap.329