NY S07084 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the diversion of funds for purposes other than those for which the funds were originally intended.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the diversion of funds for purposes other than those for which the funds were originally intended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
S00486 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY