NY S07076 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the reports a franchised thoroughbred racing corporation must make available to the franchise oversight board.
Title
Expands the reports a franchised thoroughbred racing corporation must make available to the franchise oversight board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2014-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.615 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |