NY S07055 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Ithaca city school district to establish insurance reserve funds.
Title
Allows the Ithaca city school district to establish insurance reserve funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1190 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7055A |
2018-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08738 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES