NY S07054 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validates certain acts of the Hendrick Hudson central school district with regard to two capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.3
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.336
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.375
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10753
2018-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1457
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10753 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7054

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback