NY S07023 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes participating employers in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system offering 20 year retirement plans to offer such plans on a non-contributory basis.
Title
Authorizes participating employers in the New York state and local police and fire retirement system offering 20 year retirement plans to offer such plans on a non-contributory basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.285 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.354 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a9702 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.743 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09702 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7023