NY S07021 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to buildings that are part of urban development action area projects and are rehabilitated with municipal loans.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to buildings that are part of urban development action area projects and are rehabilitated with municipal loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9364 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.890 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09364 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - signed chap.65