NY S06966 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10519
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the leasing and licensing of property by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for Sampson State Park.
Title
Relates to the leasing and licensing of property by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation for Sampson State Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10519 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1084 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6966B |
2016-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6966A |
2016-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |