NY S06960 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the use of an affiliate company to meet certain obligations of an insurer, including issuing replacement coverage in the case of a class discontinuance of individual coverage and issuing individual conversion coverage.
Title
Allows for the use of an affiliate company to meet certain obligations of an insurer, including issuing replacement coverage in the case of a class discontinuance of individual coverage and issuing individual conversion coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.388 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.584 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9208 |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2014-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.493 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09208 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6960