NY S06954 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program.
Title
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1572 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6954A |
2016-03-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10285 (Same As) 2016-05-20 - referred to housing