NY S06947 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to setting bail for defendants that pose a current physical threat to public safety.
Title
Relates to setting bail for defendants that pose a current physical threat to public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-17 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10247 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - referred to codes