NY S06945 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Steuben until December 1, 2017.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Steuben until December 1, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9302 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09302 (Same As) 2014-08-07 - signed chap.212