NY S06936 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Title
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9440 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09440 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - tabled