NY S06901 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7933C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7933C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes individuals who do not identify exclusively as a binary gender in eligibility for party positions.
Title
Includes individuals who do not identify exclusively as a binary gender in eligibility for party positions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7933C |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2021-12-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6901B |
2021-12-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2021-11-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6901A |
2021-11-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07933 (Same As) 2022-06-26 - signed chap.231