NY S06887 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates noting an address change on driver licenses and non-driver identification cards.
Title
Eliminates noting an address change on driver licenses and non-driver identification cards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a10151 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1431 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10151 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - substituted by s6887