NY S06868 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6868A
Pending: Senate Libraries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6868A
Pending: Senate Libraries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protects library access to electronic literary materials by prohibiting certain restrictive provisions in contracts between publishers and libraries.
Title
Protects library access to electronic literary materials by prohibiting certain restrictive provisions in contracts between publishers and libraries.
Sponsors
Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Sen. Jessica Scarcella-Spanton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6868A |
2024-04-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LIBRARIES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1215 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LIBRARIES |