NY S06855 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7478
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections; increases number on county committee.
Title
Increases the number of registrants an election district may contain with the approval of the county board of elections; increases number on county committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7478 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1360 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07478 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - signed chap.260