NY S06817 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that bond anticipation notes issued during calendar years 2010 and 2011 may not extend more than 7 years beyond original date of issuance of such bond notes.
Title
Provides that bond anticipation notes issued during calendar years 2010 and 2011 may not extend more than 7 years beyond original date of issuance of such bond notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.449 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09122 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - referred to local governments