NY S06813 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines freight transportation broker as any sole proprietor, partnership, firm, corporation, limited liability company, association or other legal entity that brokers the transportation of goods for outside third-party employers.
Title
Defines freight transportation broker as any sole proprietor, partnership, firm, corporation, limited liability company, association or other legal entity that brokers the transportation of goods for outside third-party employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6813A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08542 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - print number 8542b