NY S06800 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accrual of causes of action for medical, dental and podiatric malpractice; relates to the time period in which to commence an action for proceedings involving negligent failure to diagnose cancer or a malignant tumor.
Title
Relates to accrual of causes of action for medical, dental and podiatric malpractice; relates to the time period in which to commence an action for proceedings involving negligent failure to diagnose cancer or a malignant tumor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.67 |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.506 |
2017-12-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.689 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8516 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2146 |
2017-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08516 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6800