NY S06782 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.417
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau to transfer ownership of certain parklands to the Oyster Bay Water District.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau to transfer ownership of certain parklands to the Oyster Bay Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.417 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9739b |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2012-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.829 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6782B |
2012-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-04-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6782A |
2012-04-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09739 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6782b