NY S06768 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the formation of a temporary nursing program evaluation commission; requires that all RPNs either have or obtain a bachelor's degree within 10 years of initial licensure; exemptions.
Title
Relates to the formation of a temporary nursing program evaluation commission; requires that all RPNs either have or obtain a bachelor's degree within 10 years of initial licensure; exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.63 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.502 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a1842b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1938 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01842 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6768