NY S06745 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the use of remote training programs in code enforcement training to the maximum extent possible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the use of remote training programs in code enforcement training to the maximum extent possible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2024-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.399
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-05-31Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-05-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.889
2023-05-08SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A05574 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - enacting clause stricken

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback