NY S06739 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 6739A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 6739A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes James Unger, a town of West Seneca police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes James Unger, a town of West Seneca police officer, to receive certain credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6739A |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09634 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to governmental employees