NY S06733 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6733A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6733A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voter notification of special elections; provides such notice be posted on the board of elections website not less than two weeks prior to such election.
Title
Relates to voter notification of special elections; provides such notice be posted on the board of elections website not less than two weeks prior to such election.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Benjamin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6733A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08393 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES